EP1790583 - BIODEGRADABLE CAP HAVING EXCELLENT UNCAPPING PROPERTIES AND VESSEL WITH BIODEGRADABLE CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8640 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN CROWN CORK CO., LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | [2012/50] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwaicho, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN CROWN CORK CO. LTD. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Takurou, c/o Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 1-70 Yako 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Hiroaki, c/o Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 1-70 Yako 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Osamu, c/o Japan Crown Cork Co., Ltd. 2-12 Nagatoro Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0021 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Katsumi, c/o Japan Crown Cork Co., Ltd 2-12 Nagatoro Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0021 / JP | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Manley, Nicholas Michael WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Manley, Nicholas Michael WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Manley, Nicholas Michael W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05772550.9 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005JP14962 | Priority number, date | JP20040234103 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004234103 | [2007/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016703 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790583 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790583 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04, B65D41/34, B65D51/20, B65D65/46 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
B65D53/04 (KR);
B65D41/045 (EP,US);
B65D41/3428 (EP,US);
B65D51/20 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | B65D53/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE KAPPE MIT AUSGEZEICHNETEN ABNAHMEEIGENSCHAFTEN UND GEFÄSS MIT BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER KAPPE | [2007/22] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE CAP HAVING EXCELLENT UNCAPPING PROPERTIES AND VESSEL WITH BIODEGRADABLE CAP | [2007/22] | French: | BOUCHON BIODÉGRADABLE AYANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE DÉBOUCHAGE ET RÉCIPIENT AVEC BOUCHON BIODÉGRADABLE | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2007 | Translation filed | 09.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4938390 (MARKVA NEIL F [US]) [Y] 12-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0816248 (HENBASE 3172 PTY LTD [ZA]) [A] 1-19* page 2, line 50 - line 51; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1327663 (NEW ICE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]JP2003301096 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0056] * * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH11198957 (OWENS ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC); | [Y]JP2001031131 (ISHIZUKA GLASS); | [Y]JP2001199460 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003063550 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2003301096 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [Y]JP2004506792 |