EP1768918 - EASY OPEN PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company (a Delaware corporation) 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORRENTINO, Alan 17 Adams Drive Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 02 /
MOSKOVICH, Robert 20 Jensen Street East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2007/14] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05773288.5 | 15.07.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US25223 | Priority number, date | US20040894837 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: US 894837 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006020075 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768918 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768918 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/26, B65D77/38, B65D75/32, B65D75/58, B65D73/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B65D73/0042 (EP,US);
B65D75/32 (EP,US);
B65D75/5855 (EP,US);
B65D77/26 (EP,US);
B65D77/38 (EP,US);
B65D2207/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | LEICHT ZU ÖFFNENDE VERPACKUNG | [2007/14] | English: | EASY OPEN PACKAGE | [2007/14] | French: | PAQUET À OUVERTURE FACILE | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | [2016/25] |
Former [2016/21] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9103400 (GARWOOD ANTHONY JAMES MURRAY [AU]) [X] 1-8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2278103 (ARTFORM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1* figures 9,10 *; | [X]US5584388 (JOHNSON JIMMIE L [US]) [X] 1,6,9-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US5629060 (GARWOOD ANTHONY J M [US]) [X] 1-8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0238470 (EVEREADY BATTERY INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5629060 |