EP1771828 - MANAGEMENT OF THE FLOW OF PASSENGERS, BAGGAGE AND CARGO IN RELATION TO TRAVEL FACILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buenavista Street Burbank, CA 90015-0158 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALE, Gregory, B. 5205 Abelia Drive Orlando, FL 32819 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Phu, Van 5716 Bayside Drive Orlando, FL 32819 / US | 03 /
SCHWEIZER, Kenneth, W. 4739 Indian Gap Drive Orlando, FL 32812 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 05773413.9 | 22.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US26099 | Priority number, date | US20040899711 | 26.07.2004 Original published format: US 899711 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006014812 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771828 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
G07C11/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/025 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER STRÖMUNG VON PASSAGIEREN, GEPÄCK UND FRACHT IN BEZUG AUF REISEEINRICHTUNGEN | [2007/15] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF THE FLOW OF PASSENGERS, BAGGAGE AND CARGO IN RELATION TO TRAVEL FACILITIES | [2007/15] | French: | GESTION DE LA CIRCULATION DES PASSAGERS, DES BAGAGES ET DES MARCHANDISES EN RAPPORT AVEC DES INSTALLATIONS DE VOYAGE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 14.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1076319 (DISNEY ENTPR INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0116] ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5948040 (DELORME DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]US6990457 (LITMAN DAVID S [US], et al) | Examination | US5502806 |