EP1797261 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A LOCK IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIES, Wolfgang, Uwe Rathmacher Weg 38 42781 Haan / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert Patentanwälte Buse - Mentzel - Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Mentzel, Norbert Patentanwälte Buse - Mentzel - Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05774322.1 | 05.08.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP08492 | Priority number, date | DE20041048627 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048627 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037394 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797261 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797261 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, E05B65/19 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
E05B81/76 (EP);
E05B83/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR [2007/43] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN EINES SCHLOSSES IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2008/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A LOCK IN A VEHICLE | [2007/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE SERRURE D'UN VEHICULE | [2007/25] |
Former [2007/25] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BET[TIGEN EINES SCHLOSSES IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.07.2008 | FR | 01.09.2008 | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19948675 (AUDI AG) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0999323 (VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO S.P.A) [A] 1-15 * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 4, paragraph 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE20317635U (CHERRY GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE20200920U (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1 * the whole document * |