EP1801589 - METHOD OF DETECTING STRUCTURAL CHANGE IN TARGET SUGAR CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states PRECISION SYSTEM SCIENCE CO., LTD. 88 Kamihongou Matsudo-shi Chiba, 271-0064 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHIDA, Masayuki, National Inst of Adv Ind S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | 02 /
NATSUKI, Jun, National Inst of Adv Indust. S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | 03 /
TAMANO, Koichi, National Inst of Adv. Indst. S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | 04 /
TAJIMA, Hideji, Precision System Science Co., Ltd 88, Kamihongou Matsudo-shi, Chiba 271-0064 / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
MACHIDA, Masayuki, National Inst of Adv Ind S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | ||
02 /
NATSUKI, Jun, National Inst of Adv Indust. S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | |||
03 /
TAMAMO, Koichi, National Inst of Adv. Indst. S & T Tsukuba Center, 1-1-1 Higashi Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8566 / JP | |||
04 /
TAJIMA, Hideji, Precision System Science Co., Ltd 88, Kamihongou Matsudo-shi, Chiba 271-0064 / JP | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05774524.2 | 29.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP15686 | Priority number, date | JP20040248993 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004248993 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022411 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801589 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/553, G01N33/566 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINER STRUKTURÄNDERUNG IN EINER ZIELZUCKERKETTE | [2007/26] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING STRUCTURAL CHANGE IN TARGET SUGAR CHAIN | [2007/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CHANGEMENT STRUCTUREL DANS UNE CHAÎNE DE SUCRE CIBLE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2007 | Translation filed | 27.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07325083 (NAKARAI TESUKU KK); | [A]JPH09159669 (NAKANO VINEGAR CO LTD) | [A] - MATSUMOTO K. ET AL, "Antibody- lectin sandwich enzyme immunoassay for determination of altered asparagine linked sugar chains in serum transferrin of patients with hepatoma.", JPN J CLIN CHEM., (1994), vol. 23, pages 292 - 298, XP002992946 | [A] - OKAZAKI I. ET AL, "Detrmination of the interactions between lectins and glycoproteins by surface plasmon resonance.", J MOL RECOGNITION., (1995), vol. 8, pages 95 - 99, XP002992947 |