EP1796515 - SANITARY PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellcomb Aktiebolag Kulinggatan 2 652 21 Karlstad / SE | [2012/13] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Cellcomb Aktiebolag P.O. Box 114 667 22 Forshaga / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Göran Törnvägen 3 S-653 50 Karlstad / SE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05774798.2 | 30.08.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005SE01249 | Priority number, date | SE20040002126 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: SE 0402126 | SE20040002493 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: SE 0402493 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006025781 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796515 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/02, B32B7/10, B32B29/08, A61F13/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B32B5/24 (EP,US);
A47G9/02 (GB);
A47G9/0261 (EP,US);
A61F13/00 (GB);
A61F13/15252 (EP,US);
A61F13/15739 (EP,US);
A61F13/472 (EP,US);
A61F13/474 (EP,US);
A61F13/505 (EP,US);
B32B29/08 (GB);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (GB);
B32B7/14 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15406 (EP,US);
A61F2013/1591 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/20 (EP,US);
B32B2264/06 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SANITÄRPRODUKT | [2007/25] | English: | SANITARY PRODUCT | [2007/25] | French: | PRODUIT SANITAIRE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5851937 (WU PAI-CHUAN [US], et al); | [A]JPH11332924 (ICHINOMYA ORIMONO KK); | [Y]EP1145694 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]GB2384702 (NORTHERN TEXTILES PLC [GB]) |