EP1783790 - MULTILAYER CERAMIC CAPACITOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING EQUIVALENT SERIES RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSANO, Mitsuhiro MURATA MANUFACTURING CO.,LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Shizuharu MURATA MANUFACTURING CO.,LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
KUSANO, Mitsuhiro MURATA MANUF. CO.,LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | ||
02 /
WATANABE, Shizuharu MURATA MANUF. CO.,LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05775081.2 | 23.08.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005JP15270 | Priority number, date | JP20040248438 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004248438 | JP20040370533 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004370533 | WO2005JP10025 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: PCT/JP2005/010025 | [2007/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022258 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783790 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783790 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/12, H01G4/30 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
H01G4/2325 (EP);
H01G4/12 (EP);
H01G4/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTKERAMIKKONDENSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES ÄQUIVALENTEN VORWIDERSTANDES | [2010/01] | English: | MULTILAYER CERAMIC CAPACITOR AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING EQUIVALENT SERIES RESISTANCE | [2007/19] | French: | CONDENSATEUR CÉRAMIQUE MULTICOUCHE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTROLER LA RÉSISTANCE-SÉRIE ÉQUIVALENTE | [2010/01] |
Former [2007/19] | MEHRSCHICHTKERAMIKWIDERSTAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG ÄQUIVALENTEN SERIENWIDERSTANDES | ||
Former [2007/19] | CONDENSATEUR CÉRAMIQUE MULTICOUCHE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE RÉSISTANCE-SÉRIE ÉQUIVALENTE | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2007 | Translation filed | 04.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | IE | 23.08.2010 | LU | 23.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | FR | 07.09.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 23.08.2010 | ||
LU | 23.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 07.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 23.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 07.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 23.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 07.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2655179 (EUROP COMPOSANTS ELECTRON [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 19 - page 4, line 31 *; | [A]EP0777242 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * claims 12-15,19-21 *; | [A]JP2004047536 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [A] 8,17* abstract *; | [A]WO2004053901 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0011] * | International search | [Y]JP2004128328 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JPH11297581 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001223132 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JP2000223348 (TOKIN CORP); | [A]JPS61158128 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) | by applicant | JP2004128328 |