EP1792073 - INJECTION NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOECKING, Friedrich Kahlhieb 34 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 05775883.1 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP53615 | Priority number, date | DE20041044461 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044461 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029933 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792073 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M47/04 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F02M61/167 (EP);
F02M51/0603 (EP);
F02M2200/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSPRITZDÜSE | [2007/23] | English: | INJECTION NOZZLE | [2007/23] | French: | INJECTEUR | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/06] | 02.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6561436 (BOECKING FRIEDRICH) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2004016942 (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; SCHUERZ, WILLIBALD; SIMMET, MARTIN; ZINK,) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19519191 (SIEMENS AG, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US6520423 (RICCI-OTTATI GIULIO ANGEL ET AL) [DA] 1 * figure 1 * |