EP1771933 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTION OF A LINEAR MOTOR ARMATURE TO A LINEAR TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Electronics Assembly Systems GmbH & Co. KG Rupert-Mayer-Strasse 44 81379 München / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKART, Wolfgang Andreas-Sammer-Str. 11 82061 Neuried / DE | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776197.5 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005EP53495 | Priority number, date | DE20041036992 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004036992 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013156 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771933 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/02 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
F16C29/001 (EP);
F16C29/008 (EP);
F16C29/123 (EP);
H02K41/02 (EP);
H02K2213/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2007/45] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBINDEN EINES LINEARMOTORLÄUFERS AN EINE LINEARFÜHRUNG | [2007/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTION OF A LINEAR MOTOR ARMATURE TO A LINEAR TRACK | [2007/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RELIER UNE ARMATURE DE MOTEUR LINEAIRE A UNE COMMANDE LINEAIRE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08338429 ; | [A]US5176454 (SCHLERETH ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 13; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US4637738 (BARKLEY ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 44; figures 1-14 *; | [A]EP0417304 (THK CO. LTD) [A] 1-9 * column 12, line 13 - column 12, line 49; figures 1-22 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08338429 A 19961224 (THK KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |