EP1771067 - SELECTIVE INSECTICIDES BASED ON SUBSTITUTED, CYCLIC KETO-ENOLS AND SAFENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Reiner Nelly-Sachs-Str. 23 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
RECKMANN, Udo Röntgenstr. 18 50823 Köln / DE | 03 /
ROSINGER, Christopher, Hugh Am Hochfeld 33 65719 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
SANWALD, Erich Fallreep 15 24159 Kiel / DE | 05 /
ARNOLD, Christian Pastor-Löh-Str. 42 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776440.9 | 18.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005EP07794 | Priority number, date | DE20041035133 | 20.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004035133 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006008111 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771067 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771067 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/06, A01N43/08, A01N43/10, A01N43/16, A01N43/36, A01N43/38, A01P7/02, A01P7/04, A01N25/32 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (KR);
A01N35/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/08 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N35/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/08, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/10, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/16, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/38, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2007/15] | A01N43/08, A01N43/10, A01N43/16, A01N43/36, A01N35/06, // A01N43/08, A01N25/32, A01N43/10, A01N25/32, A01N43/16, A01N25/32, A01N43/36, A01N25/32, A01N35/06, A01N25/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE INSEKTIZIDE AUF BASIS VON SUBSTITUIERTEN, CYCLISCHEN KETOENOLEN UND SAFENERN | [2007/15] | English: | SELECTIVE INSECTICIDES BASED ON SUBSTITUTED, CYCLIC KETO-ENOLS AND SAFENERS | [2007/15] | French: | INSECTICIDES SELECTIFS A BASE DE CETO-ENOLS CYCLIQUES SUBSTITUES ET DE PHYTOPROTECTEURS | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2005 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | AT | 18.07.2014 | GB | 18.07.2014 | IE | 18.07.2014 | LU | 18.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
GB | 18.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [PDA]WO2004111042 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * pages 59-62; tables 1-6 * * claims 30-32 *; | [PDA]WO2004065366 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * examples A-K * * claims 11,13 *; | [PAD]WO2004080962 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PAD] 1-11 * examples A-M * * claims 25,30,35 *; | [PDA]WO2005044796 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * pages 23,24; tables 1,36 * * examples A-P * * claims 10,12 *; | [PDA]WO2005048710 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * pages 27-35 * * examples A-F * * claims 10,12,16 *; | [PDA]WO2005049569 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * pages 20-23 * * examples A-G * * claims 10,12 *; | [PDA]WO2005044791 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-11 * pages 30-34 * * examples A-H * * claims 10,12,16 *; | [DA]WO0117972 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-11 * claims 7-10 * * pages 88-93; table 3 *; | [DA]WO03062244 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-11 * page 18, paragraph 5 - page 46, paragraph 3 * * claim 7 *; | [DA]WO03013249 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-11 * pages 54-57; tables 1,3,7 * * page 84; examples I-1-a-2 * * pages 86-88; tables A-2,A-3,A-8,A-9 * * claims 1-11 *; | [DA]WO9943649 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-11 * page 148, line 13 - page 151, line 22 * * claims 1-27 *; | [DA]WO9916744 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * page 13, paragraphs 1,2 * * claims 7,9 *; | [AD]WO9507897 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * page 16, paragraph L - page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 26, line L, paragraph 1 * |