EP1906941 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF WOUNDS USING TIME RELEASE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREYSTONE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. 3251 Poplar Avenue, Suite 200 Memphis, TN 38111 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSEN, J.A. UMC St. Radboud (Hospital), Dept. of Biomaterials P.O. Box 9101, NL-6500 HB Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
HOEKSTRA, Matthias, Johannes 44 Mensinge NL-1083 HD Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
WALBOOMERS, Xaverius F. Bredestraat 115 6543 ZV Nijmegen / NL | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
JANSEN, J.A. UMC St. Radboud (Hospital), Dept. of Biomaterials P.O. Box 9101, NL-6500 HB Nijmegen / NL | ||
02 /
VOOYS, D.P.P UMC St. Radboud (Hospital), Dept. of Biomaterials P.O. Box 9101, NL-6500 HB Nijmegen / NL | |||
03 /
HOEKSTRA, Matthias Johannes 44 Mensinge NL-1083 HD Amsterdam / NL | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05776454.0 | 22.06.2005 | [2008/15] | WO2005US22306 | Priority number, date | US20040581636P | 22.06.2004 Original published format: US 581636 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006002326 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906941 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61F13/00, A61L15/44 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/40 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | A61K9/70, A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WUNDEN MIT ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2008/15] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF WOUNDS USING TIME RELEASE COMPOSITIONS | [2008/15] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE BLESSURES AU MOYEN DE COMPOSITIONS PROGRAMMABLES | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 11.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2010 | 30.06.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0401713 (HERCULES INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 3 *; | [Y]WO03017971 (LEIRAS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-10* paragraph [0003] *; | [Y]WO03045366 (GREYSTONE MEDICAL GROUP INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] * | International search | [Y]US4889844 (SILVETTI SR ANTHONY N [US], et al); | [Y]US5080900 (STANLEY R THOMAS [US]); | [Y]US6149947 (HON DAVID N-S [US], et al); | [Y]US6592890 (GREEN TERRENCE R [US]) |