EP1782639 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMISSION PARAMETER CONTROL FOR AN ANTENNA APPARATUS WITH SELECTABLE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Ruckus Wireless, Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISH, William, @c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
CHANAK, John, @c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc. 350 West Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
KISH, William, c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc. 800 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
02 /
CHANAK, John, c/o Ruckus Wireless Inc. 880 West Maude Avenue, Suite 101 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | |||
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
KISH, William, c/o Video54 Technologies, Inc. Building A, 1st Floor, 883 N Shoreline Blvd. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
CHANAK, John, c/o Video54 Technologies, Inc. Buildong A, 1st Floor, 883 N Shoreline Blvd. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Käck, Stefan Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Käck, Stefan Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 D-86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776630.5 | 29.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US26933 | Priority number, date | US20040603157P | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 603157 P | US20040602711P | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 602711 P | US20040625331P | 05.11.2004 Original published format: US 625331 P | US20050180329 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: US 180329 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006023239 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1782639 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782639 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04B7/061 (EP,US);
H04B17/24 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B7/0689 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 16.03.2007 | BA | 16.03.2007 | HR | 16.03.2007 | MK | 16.03.2007 | YU | 16.03.2007 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSPARAMETERN FÜR EINE ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSWÄHLBAREN ELEMENTEN | [2007/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMISSION PARAMETER CONTROL FOR AN ANTENNA APPARATUS WITH SELECTABLE ELEMENTS | [2007/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DESTINES A COMMANDER LES PARAMETRES DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN APPAREIL A ANTENNE AVEC DES ELEMENTS SELECTIONNABLES | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 05.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2005 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | IE | 29.07.2015 | LU | 29.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | FR | 03.08.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | GB | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.07.2005 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 03.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 03.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 03.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GB | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 03.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 03.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003228857 (MAEKI AKIRA [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0008] , [0029] - [0035] - [0064] , [0065] , [0069] , [0076] - [0100] *; | [A]US5408465 (GUSELLA RICCARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 8, line 16 - line 22 *; | [A]US2002158801 (CRILLY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0052] - [0094] - [0187] - [0190] - [0211] - [0217] - [0234] * * claims 5-8 *; | [A]US6445688 (GARCES RODRIGO [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 14 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2004017310 (VARGAS-HURLSTON SARAH [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * claim 5 * | International search | [Y]US6445688 (GARCES RODRIGO [US], et al); | [Y]US2004017310 (VARGAS-HURLSTON SARAH [US], et al); | [Y]WO03079484 (ANDREW CORP [US], et al); | [A]US6356243 (SCHNEIDER GERHARD [CH], et al); | [A]EP0534612 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US6266528 (FARZANEH FARHAD [US]) | by applicant | US2003228857 |