EP1771112 - MULTIPLE TIP LANCET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLORA, Bruce, A. 1820 Brookwood Drive Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 02 /
RUGGIERO, Joseph, E. 2212 Cambridge Drive Goshen, IN 46528 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Linhart, Angela, et al Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Linhart, Angela, et al Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776889.7 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US25664 | Priority number, date | US20040589357P | 20.07.2004 Original published format: US 589357 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006014686 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1771112 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61B17/06, A61M5/32 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
A61B17/06 (KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150427 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150526 (EP,US);
A61B5/150717 (EP,US);
A61B5/150977 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61M5/32 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANZETTE MIT MEHRFACHSPITZE | [2007/15] | English: | MULTIPLE TIP LANCET | [2007/15] | French: | LANCETTE A POINTES MULTIPLES | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2005072610 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [E] 1,3-5,9 * abstract * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 17 *; | [XY]US2003086075 (BRAIG JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * paragraphs [0212] , [0213]; figures 28,28A * [Y] 2,5-8,10-12; | [Y]US5569286 (PECKHAM ALLISON A [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,8,10,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 40 *; | [Y]EP1281411 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 5,7,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] *; | [X]US2004106941 (ROE STEVEN N [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] * |