EP1790323 - Dental polymerizable core build-up material of separately packed type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/22] | DENTAL POLYMERIZABLE CORE BUILD-UP MATERIAL OF SEPARATELY PACKED TYPE | ||
[2015/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Kuraray Medical Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA, Yasujiro, @Kuraray Noritake Dental Inc. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2016/12] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
OHARA, Yasujiro, KURARAY MEDICAL INC. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2007/22] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776894.7 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005JP15986 | Priority number, date | JP20040270202 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004270202 | [2007/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006030645 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790323 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790323 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, C08F2/44 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C08F2/44 (EP,US);
A61K6/71 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C08F2/48 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | A61K6/083 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dentales polymerisierbares Kernaufbaumaterial von getrennt verpacktem Typ | [2015/42] | English: | Dental polymerizable core build-up material of separately packed type | [2015/42] | French: | Matériau polymérisable de reconstitution d'une partie centrale de dent du type à composants emballés séparément | [2015/42] |
Former [2007/22] | DENTALES POLYMERISIERBARES KERNAUFBAUMATERIAL VONM GETRENNT VERPACKTEN TYP | ||
Former [2007/22] | DENTAL POLYMERIZABLE CORE BUILD-UP MATERIAL OF SEPARATELY PACKED TYPE | ||
Former [2007/22] | MATÉRIAU DE RECONSTITUTION D'UNE PARTIE CENTRALE DE DENT POLYMÉRISABLE DE TYPE À COMPOSANTS EMBALLÉS SÉPARÉMENT | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2007 | Translation filed | 15.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 20.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2005 | AT | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | IE | 01.09.2016 | LU | 01.09.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.09.2005 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
LU | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
LU | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5228907 (EPPINGER REGINA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 4; claims 1, 4 16 *; | [A]US6221931 (SAKUMA TETSURO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 29 - line 30; claim 2 ** column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 60 *; | [XP]JP2005170813 (TOKUYAMA CORP, et al) [XP] 1,2 * example 2; table 1 * | International search | [YP]JP2005170813 (TOKUYAMA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2001302429 (SHOFU KK); | [A]JP2002518309 ; | [A]JPH08308861 (NIPPON SHIKA YAKUHIN KK); | [A]JPH02250808 (SHOWA AUTO ENG, et al) |