EP1868784 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE EXTERIOR MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/52] | PROCESSING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE EXTERIOR MATERIAL | ||
[2008/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Tatsuya 3-19-17, Funabashi, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1560055 / JP | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776933.3 | 26.08.2005 | [2007/52] | WO2005JP16071 | Priority number, date | JP20050098607 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005098607 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006112047 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868784 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868784 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B27M1/02, G03B17/02, B27K5/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
B27M1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSENMATERIAL FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE EXTERIOR MATERIAL | [2008/44] | French: | MATERIAU EXTERIEUR DE DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2008/44] |
Former [2007/52] | BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUSSENMATERIAL FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/52] | PROCESSING APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE EXTERIOR MATERIAL | ||
Former [2007/52] | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT ET MATERIAU EXTERIEUR DE DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4444266 (SEEGER HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1,3,5 *; | [X]US6047751 (AN SUN-TAE [KR]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, lines 9-43; figure 1 *; | [XA]JP2002052510 ; | [XA]JPH10304034 ; | [X]WO02054722 (VERTU LTD [GB], et al) [X] 4,6 * page 17, lines 6-18; figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [AD]JPH1177619 ; | [AD]JPH0825301 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002052510 A 20020219 (GREEN EARTH 21:KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 4 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10304034 A 19981113 (KAWAI MUSICAL INSTR MFG CO LTD) [X] 4,6 * abstract * [A] 5 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11077619 A 19990323 (TANAHASHI MITSUHIKO) [AD] 1-4 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08025301 A 19960130 (YOKOI SHOTEN:GOUSHI) [AD] 1-4 * abstract * |