EP1758588 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN OINTMENT AND TWO SOLUBILIZED ACTIVE PRINCIPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma S.A. Zugerstrasse 8 6330 Cham / CH | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANUTTO, Leslie 2, Place des Rivaux F-43230 Paulhaguet / FR | 02 /
ORSONI, Sandrine Les Jardins de Mandelieu No. 522, rue de Boeri F-06210 Mandelieu / FR | 03 /
BARTHEZ, Nathalie Le Nicea Bat C 31, rue de Roquebillière F-06300 Nice / FR | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Allab, Myriam L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Allab, Myriam L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2007/10] | Allab, Myriam L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 05777135.4 | 15.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005FR01493 | Priority number, date | FR20040006609 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406609 | [2007/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006005842 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758588 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758588 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/573, A61K31/59, A61P17/06 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/59, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | 17.01.2007 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER SALBE UND ZWEI AUFGELÖSTEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2007/10] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN OINTMENT AND TWO SOLUBILIZED ACTIVE PRINCIPLES | [2007/10] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN ONGUENT OLEAGINEUX ET DEUX PRINCIPES ACTIFS SOLUBILISES. | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | LU | 15.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
LU | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0064450 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK], et al) [Y] 1-17 * example 3 * * claims 22,24 *; | [Y]WO0234235 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK], et al) [Y] 1-17 * example 1 * * claims 18,21 *; | FR2848454 [ ] (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]); | [PLX]WO2004054588 (GALDERMA RES & DEV S N C SOPHI [FR], et al) [PLX] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y] - LAHFA M ET AL, "CALCITRIOL OINTMENT AND CLOBETASOL PROPIONATE CREAM: A NEW REGIMEN FOR THE TREATMENT OF PLAQUE PSORIASIS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, XX, XX, (200305), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 1167-1122, pages 261 - 265, XP009016887 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | [T] - ANONYMOUS, "Dovobet Oinment", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20041101), URL: http://emc.medicines.org.uk/emc/assets/c/html/displaydoc.asp?documentid=8851#COMPOSITION, (20050119), XP002314150 [T] 1-17 * paragraph [06.1] * | [Y] - LAMBA S ET AL, "Combination therapy with vitamin D analogues", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, XX, XX, (200104), vol. 144, no. Supplement 58, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 27 - 32, XP002253887 [Y] 1-17 * page 28, column 2, paragraph L - page 29, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [PY] - KRAGBALLE K ET AL, "Efficacy of once-daily treatment regimens with calcipotriol/betamethasone dipropionate ointment and calcipotriol ointment in psoriasis vulgaris.", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY. JUN 2004, (200406), vol. 150, no. 6, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 1167 - 1173, XP001205154 [PY] 1-17 * Summary * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2133.2004.05986.x |