EP1913884 - DIGITISED SPINAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arvizo Arvizo, Aldo Antonio de Montes 5701, Col. Panamericana C.P. 31200 Chihuahua, Chihuahua / MX | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Lorente Berges, Ana, et al A2 Estudio Legal C/ Maria de Molina n° 41 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Lorente Berges, Ana, et al Avenida General Perón N° 19 Planta Baja, Puerta C 28020 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/17] | Lorente Berges, Ana, et al C/Félix Boix 3 - 7. C 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05777237.8 | 04.08.2005 | [2008/17] | WO2005MX00065 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007015634 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913884 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/701 (EP,US);
A61B17/7004 (EP,US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | DIGITALISIERTES WIRBELSÄULENSYSTEM | [2008/17] | English: | DIGITISED SPINAL SYSTEM | [2008/17] | French: | SYSTEME SPINAL NUMERISE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2008 | Translation filed | 01.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 20.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2010 | 31.08.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3639522 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5209751 (FARRIS ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 15 * * figures 1b, 5a *; | [XA]US5452407 (CROOK DAVID F [US]) [X] 7 * column 2, line 58 - column 8, line 2 * * figures 2-11 *[A] 1 | International search | [A]US6719795 (CORNWALL G BRYAN [US], et al); | [A]US4697582 (WILLIAM PEZE [FR]) |