EP1778249 - PHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS OF A 2'-FLUORO-2',3'-DIDEHYDRO-2',3'-DIDEOXYADENOSINE ANALOGUE AS ANTI-HIV AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | NUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHONATE CONJUGATES AS ANTI HIV AGENTS | ||
[2009/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City CA 94404 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOJAMRA, Constantine G. 1 Worth Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 02 /
LIN, Kuei-Ying 1441 Ramon Dr. Sunnyvale, CA94087-5833 / US | 03 /
MACKMAN, Richard L. 360 Ashton Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 04 /
MARKEVITCH, David Y. 3165 Sepulveda Blvd. 308 Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | 05 /
PETRAKOVSKY, Oleg V. 1109 State Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | 06 /
RAY, Adrian, S. 19 Pilot Circle Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Lijun 4033 Middlefield Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
BOOJAMRA, Constantine G. 1 Worth Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | ||
02 /
LIN, Kuei-Ying 1441 Ramon Dr. Sunnyvale, CA94087-5833 / US | |||
03 /
MACKMAN, Richard L. 360 Ashton Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | |||
04 /
MARKEVITCH, David Y. 3165 Sepulveda Blvd. 308 Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | |||
05 /
PETRAKOVSKY, Oleg V. 1109 State Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | |||
06 /
RAY, Adrian, S. 1927 Bridgepoint Circle, J231 San Mateo, California 94404 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Lijun 4033 Middlefield Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
BOOJAMRA, Constantine G. 1 Worth Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | ||
02 /
LIN, Kuei-Ying 4774 Canvasback Common Fremont, CA 94555 / US | |||
03 /
MACKMAN, Richard L. 360 Ashton Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | |||
04 /
MARKEVITCH, David Y. 3165 Sepulveda Blvd. 308 Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | |||
05 /
PETRAKOVSKY, Oleg V. 1109 State Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | |||
06 /
RAY, Adrian, S. 1927 Bridgepoint Circle, J231 San Mateo, California 94404 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Lijun 4033 Middlefield Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05777315.2 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US27088 | Priority number, date | US20040591811P | 27.07.2004 Original published format: US 591811 P | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006015261 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778249 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778249 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, C07F9/44, A61K47/48, A61K31/7076, A61K31/662, A61P31/18 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07H19/16 (EP,NO,US);
C07F9/38 (KR,NO);
C07F9/02 (KR);
A61K31/341 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (KR,NO,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/683 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (NO);
A61K45/06 (EP,NO,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP,NO);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F9/40 (NO);
C07F9/44 (NO);
C07F9/65616 (EP,NO,US);
C07H19/00 (EP,NO,US);
C07H19/20 (EP,NO,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/341, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/683, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/13] | A61K31/662, C07F9/38, A61K47/48, A61P31/18 | ||
Former IPC [2007/18] | A61K31/662 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | 26.02.2007 | BA | 26.02.2007 | HR | 26.02.2007 | MK | 26.02.2007 | YU | 26.02.2007 | Title | German: | PHOSPHONAT PRODROGEN VON EINEM ANALOG DES 2'-FLUORO-2',3'-DIDEHYDRO-2',3'-DIDEOXYADENOSINS ALS ANTI-HIV MITTEL | [2009/48] | English: | PHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS OF A 2'-FLUORO-2',3'-DIDEHYDRO-2',3'-DIDEOXYADENOSINE ANALOGUE AS ANTI-HIV AGENTS | [2009/48] | French: | PRODROGUES PHOSPHONATE D'UN ANALOGUE DE LA 2'-FLUORO-2',3'-DIDÉHYDRO-2',3'-DIDÉSOXYADÉNOSINE COMME AGENTS ANTI-VIH | [2009/48] |
Former [2007/18] | NUKLEOSID PHOSPHONAT KONJUGATE ALS ANTI HIV MITTEL | ||
Former [2007/18] | NUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHONATE CONJUGATES AS ANTI HIV AGENTS | ||
Former [2007/18] | CONJUGUES DE PHOSPHONATE NUCLEOSIDIQUE COMME AGENTS ANTI-VIH | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | IE | 27.07.2010 | LU | 27.07.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | HU | 27.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
LU | 27.07.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
IE | 27.07.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9119721 (GLAZIER ARNOLD [US]); | [X]WO9200988 (BODOR NICHOLAS S [US]); | [X]WO9324510 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [X]RU2106353 (KORPORATSIJA S EHND TI SAJENS [GB]); | [X]RU2188203 (EKHNOLOGII VEKTOR, et al); | [X]WO03090690 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO03091264 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO2004096233 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al); |