EP1809274 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR RECTAL OR VAGINAL APPLICATION COMPRISING A PLATINUM COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pliva Lachema A.S, v. likvidaci. Karasek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ | [2015/22] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Pliva-Lachema A.S. Karásek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANC, Ales Purkynova 19 612 00 Brno / CZ | 02 /
SOVA, Petr Jungmanova 1390 500 02 Hradec Králové / CZ | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Pavlica, Tomas, et al H&P Patents s.r.o. Na Florenci 1332/23 110 00 Praha 1 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Pavlica, Tomas, et al Traplová, Hakr, Kubát Law and Patent Offices Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | ||
Former [2007/30] | Hak, Roman Traplova - Hakr - Kubat, Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 05777365.7 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005CZ00068 | Priority number, date | CZ20040000945 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: CZ 20040945 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006026935 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1809274 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/282, A61K9/02, A61K47/42, A61K47/26 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61K9/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K9/0031 (EP,US);
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 03.04.2007 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REKTALEN ODER VAGINALEN ANWENDUNG MIT EINEM PLATINKOMPLEX | [2007/30] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR RECTAL OR VAGINAL APPLICATION COMPRISING A PLATINUM COMPLEX | [2007/30] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINEE A UNE APPLICATION RECTALE OU VAGINALE, CONTENANT UN COMPLEXE À BASE DE PLATINE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | 30.10.2013 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2007 | 13.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.01.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/16] | 13.04.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/16] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | PT | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | GB | 07.09.2010 | IE | 07.09.2010 | LU | 07.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/32] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
LU | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
LU | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
LU | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
GB | 07.09.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6136336 (TANAKA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 6 * * examples 1-3 *; | [PY]EP1523984 (SALAMA ZOSER B [DE]) [PY] 1-13 * page 6, line 46 - page 7, line 26 * * claims 1,2,8 *; | [Y] - CHEN Q M ET AL, "The stability of carboplatin suppository", CHINESE PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL 2000 CHINA, (2000), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 1001-2494, pages 168 - 171, XP009069276 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - MATSUHISA T ET AL, "Preparation of cisplatin suppository and its clinical evaluation", IRYO - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF NATIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES 1994 JAPAN, (1994), vol. 48, no. 8, ISSN 0021-1699, pages 612 - 616, XP009069277 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [PY] - WAKATSUKI KAZUO ET AL, "Effects of irradiation combined with cis-diamminedichloroplatinum (CDDP) suppository in rabbit VX2 rectal tumors.", WORLD JOURNAL OF SURGERY. MAR 2005, (200503), vol. 29, no. 3, ISSN 0364-2313, pages 388 - 395, XP002389724 [PY] 1-13 * page 388, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00268-004-7625-8 |