EP1791728 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING REFLECTOR ANSWER SIGNALS OF A SYSTEM FOR RECOGNISING THE OCCUPANCY OF A SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/23] | METHOD FOR AVALUATING REFLECTOR ANSWER SIGNALS OF A SYSTEM FOR RECOGNISING THE OCCUPANCY OF A SEAT | ||
[2009/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖSEL, Birgit In der Oberen Au 21 93055 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
STIELOW, Arnd Donaustaufer Str. 127h 93059 Regenburg / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Roland Fraunhoferstr. 19 93093 Donaustauf / DE | 04 /
HOFBECK, Klaus Gössweinstr. 3 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 05777730.2 | 11.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP53963 | Priority number, date | DE20041046189 | 23.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004046189 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032582 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791728 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791728 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
B60R21/01536 (EP,US);
B60R21/01 (KR);
B60R21/015 (KR);
B60R21/01534 (EP);
B60R21/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/01] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSWERTEN VON REFLEKTORANTWORTSIGNALEN EINES SYSTEMS ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER SITZBELEGUNG | [2007/23] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING REFLECTOR ANSWER SIGNALS OF A SYSTEM FOR RECOGNISING THE OCCUPANCY OF A SEAT | [2009/03] | French: | PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DE SIGNAUX DE REPONSE DE REFLECTEUR D'UN SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE L'OCCUPATION D'UN SIEGE | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/23] | METHOD FOR AVALUATING REFLECTOR ANSWER SIGNALS OF A SYSTEM FOR RECOGNISING THE OCCUPANCY OF A SEAT | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 16.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.2009 | GB | 11.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | FR | 31.08.2009 | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/01] | GB | 11.08.2009 | |
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | ES | 17.08.2009 | |
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | ES | 17.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004045917 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6462701 (FINN JAMES S [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, lines 57-67 * * column 7, lines 41-57 *; | [A]US6199904 (DOSDALL JAMES MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 47-56 * |