EP1802859 - METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM ESPECIALLY OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORSTMANN, Peter Auf Der Stelle 17/1 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Stefan Wuerttembergstr. 207 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/27] | Application number, filing date | 05777980.3 | 18.08.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005EP54071 | Priority number, date | DE20041049812 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049812 | [2007/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040212 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802859 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/38, F02D41/24, F02M63/02 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
F02D41/3845 (EP,US);
F02D41/1402 (EP,US);
F02D41/2467 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1409 (EP,US);
F02D2041/141 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1422 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/16] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZANLAGE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2007/27] | English: | METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM ESPECIALLY OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/27] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT EN PARTICULIER D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 10.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0735260 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * column 2, lines 52-57 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 21 * * column 6, lines 1-9 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 47 * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE10044412 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4* column A; figure 2 *; | [X]US6497223 (TUKEN TANER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-12 * column 11, line 36 - column 13, line 14 *; | [X]US6581574 (MORAN KEVIN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * figures 4,5 * * column 2, lines 23-30 * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 4 *; | [X]DE10162989 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] , [0046]; figures 2,3 * |