EP1778238 - DIHYDROPTERIDINONE INFUSION SOLUTION HAVING A LONG SHELF LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | |||
Former [2007/18] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
LI
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHR, Detlef Braendlinweg 13 88400 Biberach / DE | 02 /
VEIT, Claus Fabrikstr. 10 88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
TRAULSEN, Fridtjof Steigstr. 19 88400 Biberach / DE | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 D-55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 05778137.9 | 11.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005EP08735 | Priority number, date | EP20040019363 | 14.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04019363 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006018221 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1778238 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778238 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (CN);
A61J1/05 (CN);
A61J1/10 (CN);
A61K31/519 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/183 (CN);
A61K47/20 (CN);
A61K47/22 (CN);
A61K47/26 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | BA | 14.03.2007 | HR | 14.03.2007 | YU | 14.03.2007 | Title | German: | LAGERSTABILE INFUSIONSLÖSUNG VON DIHYDROPTERIDINONEN | [2007/18] | English: | DIHYDROPTERIDINONE INFUSION SOLUTION HAVING A LONG SHELF LIFE | [2007/18] | French: | SOLUTIONS DE PERFUSION DE DIHYDROPTERIDINONES STABLES AU STOCKAGE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 20.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03020722 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 91, lines 21-27; claim - * | Examination | WO0178732 |