EP1912593 - ENDOVENOUS STENT AND VENOUS NEOVALVULAR ENDOBIOPROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sango S.A.S. di Cattani Rita e C. Via Casole d'Elsa, 15/C1 00139 Roma / IT | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMILLI, Sante Via Lombardia, 30 I-00187 Roma / IT | 02 /
CAMILLI, Daniele Via Casole d'Elsa, 15 I-00139 Roma / IT | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 05778704.6 | 27.07.2005 | [2008/17] | WO2005IT00450 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007013108 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912593 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2475 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOVENÖSER STENT UND VENÖSE NEOVALVULÄRE ENDOBIOPROTHESE | [2008/17] | English: | ENDOVENOUS STENT AND VENOUS NEOVALVULAR ENDOBIOPROSTHESIS | [2008/17] | French: | STENT ENDOVEINEUX ET PROTHÈSE ENDOBIOLOGIQUE NÉOVALVULAIRE VEINEUSE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6299637 (SHAOLIAN SAMUEL M [US], et al) [XD] 1-3 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 42 - column 12, line 3 *; | [A]US2002111665 (LAUTERJUNG KARL-LUTZ [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 2,4,23 ** paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]US2003125795 (PAVCNIK DUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 17 * * paragraph [0038] *; | [X]US2004019374 (HOJEIBANE HIKMAT [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0207] *; | [X]US2004210306 (QUIJANO RODOLFO C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0057] * |