EP1759233 - SMALL-SIZED MICRO-CABLE-LAYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states France Telecom S.A. 6 Place d'Alleray 75505 Paris Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECOQ, Daniel 8 Lotissement Communal F-22140 BERTHET / FR | 02 /
VILLALON, Céline 6, Place Pierre Bourdan F-44600 SAINT NAZAIRE / FR | 03 /
REAU-THOMAS, Anne-Cécile 6 Rue Salud Ar Sklerder F-22560 PLEUMEUR-BODOU / FR | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
LECOQ, Daniel 8 Lotissement Communal F-22140 BERTHET / FR | ||
02 /
JEVIC, Céline Le Vincennes 14 Avenue du Baulois F-44380 PORNICHET / FR | |||
03 /
REAU-THOMAS, Anne-Cécile 6 Rue Salud Ar Sklerder F-22560 PLEUMEUR-BODOU / FR | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/10] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05778899.4 | 22.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005FR01565 | Priority number, date | FR20040006900 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406900 | [2007/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010813 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759233 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759233 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/52, H02G1/08 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
H02G1/086 (EP,US);
G02B6/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEINE MIKROKABELVERLEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/10] | English: | SMALL-SIZED MICRO-CABLE-LAYING DEVICE | [2007/10] | French: | ENTRAINEUR DE MICRO-CABLE OPTIQUE D'ENCOMBREMENT REDUIT | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | IT | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | PL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | LU | 22.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CY | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
TR | 07.05.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
LU | 22.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 07.05.2008 | |
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2774777 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [AD] 1-10* figure 2 *; | [A]GB2388966 (CBS PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * |