EP1851418 - HEAT ENERGY RECAPTURE AND RECYCLE AND ITS NEW APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christian School of Technology Charitable Foundation Trust 12 Leaf Terrace San Diego, CA 92114-6816 / US | For all designated states Labrador, Gaudencio Aquino 1312 Leaf Terrace San Diego, CA 92114-6816 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05779535.3 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/45] | WO2005US26793 | Priority number, date | US20050039624 | 20.01.2005 Original published format: US 39624 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006078315 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851418 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01K27/00, F02C1/05, F03G7/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
F01K27/00 (EP,US);
F02C1/05 (EP,US);
F03G7/00 (EP,US);
F05D2260/212 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | F01K23/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEENERGIERÜCKGEWINNUNG UND -WIEDERVERWERTUNG AND IHRE NEUE ANWENDUNG | [2007/45] | English: | HEAT ENERGY RECAPTURE AND RECYCLE AND ITS NEW APPLICATIONS | [2007/45] | French: | REPRISE ET RECYCLAGE DE L'ENERGIE THERMIQUE ET LEURS NOUVELLES APPLICATIONS | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 24.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2009 | 31.07.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]US6327994 (LABRADOR GAUDENCIO A [US]) |