EP1750841 - ANALYTICAL SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND CARTRIDGES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | [2016/47] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states Ascensia Diabetes Care Holdings AG Peter-Merian Strasse 90 4052 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Metrika, Inc. 510 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale CA 94085-4022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATT, Joel, M. 2149 Junction Avenue, Unit 7 Mountain View, CA 94043-2849 / US | 02 /
STIVERS, Carole, R. 2732 Ross Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack, et al Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Linhart, Angela, et al Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05779766.4 | 04.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US15754 | Priority number, date | US20040840344 | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 840344 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005116632 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750841 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L3/00 (KR);
G01N21/8483 (EP,US);
G01N31/22 (KR);
G01N33/00 (KR);
G01N33/0009 (US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N35/00009 (US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01N33/48707 (EP);
G01N33/525 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | 04.12.2006 | BA | 04.12.2006 | HR | 04.12.2006 | LV | 04.12.2006 | MK | 04.12.2006 | YU | 04.12.2006 | Title | German: | ANALYTISCHE SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND KARTUSCHEN DAFÜR | [2007/07] | English: | ANALYTICAL SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND CARTRIDGES THEREFOR | [2007/07] | French: | SYSTEMES, DISPOSITIFS ANALYTIQUES ET CARTOUCHES ASSOCIEES | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0397424 (BIOTRACK INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 16 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 36 * * page 7, line 18 - line 34 * * page 7, line 53 - line 58 * * page 11, line 28 - line 44 * * figure - * [Y] 38-67; | [A]US5223219 (SUBRAMANIAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-67 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 5 * * column 11, line 1 - column 12, line 10 * * figures 1a-1d *; | [A]WO0117797 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US]) [A] 1-67 * page 7, line 4 - line 23 * * page 15, line 32 - page 17, line 23 ** figure - *; | [DY] - NEELEY W E, "A REFLECTANCE PHOTOMETER WITH A SQUARE PHOTODIODE ARRAY DETECTOR FOR USE ON MULTILAYER DRY-FILM SLIDES", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19881101), vol. 34, no. 11, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 2367 - 2370, XP000001843 [DY] 38-67 * page 2367, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2369, column L, paragraph 2 * | Examination | US2004005582 |