EP1790907 - METHOD OF TREATING OIL/WATER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio Media Co. Ltd. MOA Bldg. 501 5-11, Sotokanda 6-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010021 / JP | For all designated states Hashiba, Tomohiko C/o Bio Media Co. Ltd. MOA Bldg. 501 5-11, Sotokanda 6-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010021 / JP | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIBA, Tomohiko, Bio Media Co., Ltd. MOA Bldg. 501, 5-11, Sotokanda 6-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010021 / JP | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Epping, Wilhelm Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05780366.0 | 17.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005JP15008 | Priority number, date | JP20040237733 | 17.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004237733 | [2007/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006019113 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790907 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/05, B63B25/08, B63B35/32, F23D11/16, F23K5/12 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
B63B25/08 (KR);
B63B35/32 (EP,KR,US);
F23D11/107 (EP,US);
F23D11/16 (EP,KR,US);
F23G5/02 (EP,US);
F23G7/05 (EP,KR,US);
F23K5/12 (EP,US);
F23G2900/54402 (EP,US);
F23K2900/05084 (EP,US);
Y02E20/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ÖL/WASSERGEMISCHEN | [2007/22] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING OIL/WATER MIXTURE | [2007/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D"UN MÉLANGE PÉTROLE/EAU | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2007 | Translation filed | 16.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003008252 (WATANABE MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figures 6-10 * [Y] 7-9; | [Y]JP2001173930 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 7-9 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP1031789 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure . * | International search | [Y]JP2001173930 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JP2003021309 (KOUDA TOSHIYUKI, et al); | [Y]JP2001323288 (KANAGAWA HOKEN JIGYOSHA KK); | [A]JP2003062493 (HASHIBA TOMOHIKO, et al); | [A]JPS5728913 (SHIN NIPPON ENGINEERING YUUGEN) | by applicant | JP2001139964 | JPH08277396 | JP2002098325 | JPH0116615 | JP2001173930 |