EP1784260 - MICROFLUID SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALASSO, Irio Giuseppe Kronenhofweg 1 6415 Arth / CH | 02 /
GRISS, Patrick Elsastrasse 20 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | 03 /
SAROFIM, Emad Hofmatt 74 CH-6332 Hagendorn / CH | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
CALASSO, Irio Guiseppe Kronenhofweg 1 6415 Arth / CH | ||
02 /
GRISS, Patrick Elsastrasse 20 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
SAROFIM, Emad Hofmatt 74 CH-6332 Hagendorn / CH | |||
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
CALASSO, Irio Guiseppe Kronenhofweg 1 6415 Arth / CH | ||
02 /
GRISS, Patrick Elsastrasse 20 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
SAROFIM, Emad Elsastrasse 20 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | |||
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
CALASSO, Irio Guiseppe Kronenhofweg 1 6415 Arth / CH | ||
02 /
GRISS, Patrick Kronenhofweg 1 CH-6415 Arth / CH | |||
03 /
SAROFIM, Emad Elsastrasse 20 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05780984.0 | 18.08.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP08934 | Priority number, date | EP20040019759 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04019759 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006021361 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784260 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61B5/00, A61B5/15 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/15045 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDIKSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2007/20] | English: | MICROFLUID SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2007/20] | French: | SYSTEME MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT SYSTEME | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5700695 (YASSINZADEH ZIA [US], et al) [A] 1,19,20* column 1, lines 41-44; figures 1,2; claim - *; | [X]WO02051549 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES SF CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,19 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 19; figures 1,2 * * page 15, lines 1-15; figure 7 *; | [X]WO03071263 (GENOME INST OF SINGAPORE NAT U [SG], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * page 18, line 1 - page 23, line 27 * * page 33, line 10 - page 34, line 23; figures 1,2 * * claims 32,35 *; | [X]EP1391716 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [X] 1,3,19,20 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 3-5 * | Examination | EP0949002 | US2003029723 | by applicant | US2002168290 |