EP1941496 - PROCESSING ENCODED REAL-TIME DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYLDGAARD, Kim Egeskovvej 12 Ilskov DK-7451 Sunds / DK | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05781633.2 | 01.09.2005 | [2008/28] | WO2005EP09421 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025561 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941496 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941496 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON CODIERTEN ECHTZEITDATEN | [2008/28] | English: | PROCESSING ENCODED REAL-TIME DATA | [2008/28] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES TEMPS REEL CODEES | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | LV | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | LU | 01.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3688097 (MONTGOMERY WILLIAM LLOYD) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]GB1528954 (POST OFFICE) [Y] 1-7,10-17,20-23 * page 1, column R, line 87 - page 2, column L, line 27; table 1 *; | [A]US5715309 (BARTKOWIAK JOHN G [US]) [A] 10,20 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 62 *; | [Y] - PERKINS C ET AL, "A SURVEY OF PACKET LOSS RECOVERY TECHNIQUES FOR STREAMING AUDIO", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199809), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 40 - 48, XP000875014 [Y] 1-7,10-17,20-23 * page 41, column L, line 6 - line 26 * * page 45, column R, line 14 - line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.730750 | [A] - "Understanding PCM Coding", HARRIS SEMICONDUCTORS APPLICATION NOTE AN574.1, (1997), pages 1 - 4, XP002375229 [A] 1-23 * page 2, column L, paragraph 2 - page 3, column L, paragraph 1 * |