EP1810607 - RECEIVING DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCTION INTO SPECIMEN UNDER TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Olympus Optical Corporation Limited 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGEMORI, Toshiaki 1-18-1-C201, Kuboyamacho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920023 / JP | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05782010.2 | 09.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005JP16651 | Priority number, date | JP20040263002 | 09.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004263002 | [2007/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006028220 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810607 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B5/07, A61B1/04 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
A61B1/00036 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US);
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B5/07 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | A61B1/00, A61B5/07 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/39] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR EINFÜHRUNG IN EINE TESTPROBE | [2007/30] | English: | RECEIVING DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCTION INTO SPECIMEN UNDER TEST | [2007/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET SYSTÈME D'INTRODUCTION DANS UN SPÉCIMEN SOUS TEST | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/30] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET SYSTÈME D INTRODUCTION DANS UN SPÉCIMEN SOUS TEST | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2007 | Translation filed | 15.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.2007 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | BG   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | CY   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | CZ   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | DK   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | EE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | FI   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | HU   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | IE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | IS   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | LT   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | LV   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | MC   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | PL   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | PT   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | RO   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | SI   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | SK   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.2007 | TR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002173718 (FRISCH MORDECHAI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0021] , [0023] , [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004076222 (DE FRANCESCO RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 3,4,7 * paragraph [0054] *; | [Y]US2004116168 (USUI HISAYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figure 10 *; | [A]JP2004179861 (NEC ACCESS TECHNICA LTD) [A] 1* paragraph [0006] * | International search | [Y]JP2003019111 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD); | [Y]JP2004201222 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |