EP1781553 - FLUID OR POWDERY PRODUCT DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valois SAS BP G, Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | [2012/32] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Valois SAS BP G, Le Prieuré F - 27110 Le Neubourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACUK, Christophe 81 rue Bernard Chédeville F-27100 LE VAUDREUIL / FR | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [2012/32] |
Former [2007/19] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05782026.8 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005FR50528 | Priority number, date | FR20040007315 | 01.07.2004 Original published format: FR 0407315 | [2007/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013304 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781553 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781553 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B65D83/75 (EP,US);
B65D2213/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/41] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR FLÜSSIGE ODER PULVERFÖRMIGE PRODUKTE | [2007/19] | English: | FLUID OR POWDERY PRODUCT DISPENSER | [2007/19] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE OU PULVERULENT | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 27.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2013
07.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | 02
06.05.2013
15.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE MeadWestvaco Calmar GmbH Ernst-Stenner-Strasse 17 58675 Hemer / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2013
07.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
02
06.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE MeadWestvaco Calmar GmbH Ernst-Stenner-Strasse 17 58675 Hemer / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2013/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2013
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | 14.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.02.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.06.2013 | [2014/24] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0110743 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 3; figure -; claim 15 *; | [AD]WO02051483 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6149892 (BRITTO IGNATIUS LOY [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2004056054 (OTTOLANGUI DAVID MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4819837 (GOFORTH MELVIN L [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [AD]EP1304355 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |