EP1791902 - NON-HALOGENATED FLAME-RESISTANT THERMOPLASTIC MOULDED MASSES MADE FROM POLYAMIDE WITH INCREASED INCANDESCENT WIRE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. ENDTNER, Jochen Suevenstrasse 6 50679 Köln / DE | 02 /
JOACHIMI, Detlev Scheiblerstr. 103 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
WEIDER, Richard In der Dasladen 14 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
ENDTNER, Jochen Jakob-Böhme-Str. 4 51065 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
JOACHIMI, Detlev Scheiblerstr. 103 47800 Krefeld / DE | |||
03 /
WEIDER, Richard In der Dasladen 14 51381 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 05782454.2 | 31.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP09362 | Priority number, date | DE20041044131 | 13.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044131 | DE20041048876 | 07.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048876 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029711 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791902 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791902 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/3492, C08L77/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C08K5/34928 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08J5/10 (KR);
C08K5/3492 (KR);
C08K5/5313 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/34928, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/5313, C08L77/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | HALOGENFREIE FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE THERMOPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN AUF BASIS VON POLYAMID MIT ERHÖHTER GLÜHDRAHTBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2007/23] | English: | NON-HALOGENATED FLAME-RESISTANT THERMOPLASTIC MOULDED MASSES MADE FROM POLYAMIDE WITH INCREASED INCANDESCENT WIRE RESISTANCE | [2007/23] | French: | MATIERES A MOULER THERMOPLASTIQUES IGNIFUGEES ET SANS HALOGENE A BASE DE POLYAMIDE PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE ACCRUE AUX FILAMENTS CHAUFFANTS | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2005 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | LV | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | GB | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | LU | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
GB | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
LU | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
GB | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
GB | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
GB | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
LV | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002002228 (TAKEDA TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0012]; examples 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US2002096669 (VAN DER SPEK PIETER A [NL], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] - [0018] - [0020] - [0022]; claims 1-16 *; | [PX]FR2864097 (RHODIA ENGINNERING PLASTICS [IT]) [PX] 1-7* page 2, line 6 - page 9, line 7; examples 1-3; claims 1-14 * | by applicant | DE2252258 | US3900444 | DE2447727 | US4036811 | EP0024167 | WO9701664 | US5669095 | WO9839306 | DE19734437 | DE19737727 | US6207736 | US2002002228 | US2002009669 | WO0228953 | US6509401 | US2004021135 | WO2004016684 |