EP1799648 - 4-AMINO SUBSTITUTED-2-SUBSTITUTED-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNUS-ARYITEY, George Tetteh Pfizer Global R & D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
RUGGERI, Roger Benjamin Pfizer Global R & D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 03 /
SHANKER, Ravi Mysore Pfizer Global R & D Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 04 /
GARR, Cheryl Denise Bend Research Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | 05 /
LORENZ, Douglas Alan Bend Research Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Rudge, Andrew John ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Rudge, Andrew John Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05783652.0 | 12.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005IB02880 | Priority number, date | US20040612860P | 23.09.2004 Original published format: US 612860 P | US20050658704P | 03.03.2005 Original published format: US 658704 P | US20050187854 | 25.07.2005 Original published format: US 187854 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033002 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799648 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/42, C07D401/12, C07D405/14, C07D401/14, A61K31/4706, A61K31/4709, A61P3/06 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D215/38 (KR);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61K31/4706 (KR);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D215/42 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | 23.04.2007 | BA | 23.04.2007 | HR | 23.04.2007 | MK | 23.04.2007 | YU | 23.04.2007 | Title | German: | 4-AMINO-SUBSTITUIERTE 2-SUBSTITUIERTE 1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROCHINOLINVERBINDUNGEN | [2007/26] | English: | 4-AMINO SUBSTITUTED-2-SUBSTITUTED-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE COMPOUNDS | [2007/26] | French: | COMPOSES DE 4-AMINO SUBSTITUE-2-SUBSTITUE-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROQUINOLINE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0987251 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,10-18* claims 1,30,42 *; | [X]WO2004004777 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,2 *; | [E]WO2005095409 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [E] 1-18 * claims 1,25 * |