EP1784809 - SUBSTRATES WITH MULTIPLE IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMSLANDER, Jeffrey, O. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Kenneth, B. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ACITO, Paul, L. 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783734.6 | 05.08.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005US27973 | Priority number, date | US20040933149 | 02.09.2004 Original published format: US 933149 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006028626 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784809 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/12, B41M3/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B44F1/10 (EP,US);
B41M3/008 (EP,US);
G09F13/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATE MIT MEHREREN BILDERN | [2007/20] | English: | SUBSTRATES WITH MULTIPLE IMAGES | [2007/20] | French: | SUBSTRATS PRESENTANT PLUSIEURS IMAGES | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2381116 (GARDNER RICHARD JAMES ERNIE [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,9,11-16,20,21,28 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 4; figure 2 * [Y] 17-19; | [X]US2002034608 (AELING ELLEN O [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11-16,20,21,28 * page 2, paragraph 33 - page 4, line 57; figures 3,4,7 *; | [X]US6258429 (NELSON STEPHEN G [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11-14,22,28 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 10; figure 2 *; | [DYA]US6577355 (YANIV ZVI [US]) [DY] 17-19 * the whole document * [A] 1-16,20-28; | [DA]US5962109 (SCHWIETZ WILLIAM T [US]) [DA] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6254711 | US3888029 | US5962109 | US6226906 | US6577355 | WO2004042684 | WO9747481 | US2004090399 | GB2381116 |