EP1805738 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING A CURRENCY EXCHANGE TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fidos Ltd. Gordon House 6 Lissenden Gardens London NW5 1LX / GB | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seon, Ho Ulsan Jung-Gu Taehwa-Dong 171 Namun Park 702 / KR | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783764.3 | 15.09.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005GB03575 | Priority number, date | US20040947037 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: US 947037 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032849 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805738 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/381 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VEREINFACHUNG EINER WÄHRUNGSUMTAUSCHTRANSAKTION | [2007/28] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING A CURRENCY EXCHANGE TRANSACTION | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR FACILITER UNE TRANSACTION DE CHANGE DE DEVISES | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2376124 (SIM YONG HOCK LAWRENCE [SG]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph L * * figure - *; | [X]WO9921141 (KORMAN BRUCE R [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1, lines 6,7 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 15 * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 37 - page 11, line 28 * * page 12, line 6 - page 14, line 8 * * figure - *; | [X]US2003046234 (TAKADACHI MASATO [JP]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] - [0029] - [0031] - [0040] , [0043] - [0049] * * figure - *; | [X]WO03071386 (COINSTAR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 1 * * figure - * |