EP1788769 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING A SERVICE IN THE TRANSPORT LAYER OF AN NGN NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Haoze, Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
LU, Haoze, Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783981.3 | 05.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005CN01402 | Priority number, date | CN2004174520 | 06.09.2004 Original published format: CN200410074520 | [2007/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026913 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788769 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788769 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/02 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
H04L47/825 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L45/50 (EP,US);
H04L45/62 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES DIENSTES IN DIE TRANSPORTSCHICHT EINES NGN-NETZES | [2007/21] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING A SERVICE IN THE TRANSPORT LAYER OF AN NGN NETWORK | [2007/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN SERVICE DANS LA COUCHE DE TRANSPORT D'UN RESEAU NGN | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2007 | Translation filed | 09.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 24.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | HU | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | LV | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | IE | 05.09.2011 | LU | 05.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 05.09.2011 | ||
LU | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 05.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 13.07.2011 | |
IS | 13.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HING-KAM LANG, LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, "Management and Control for NGN", TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARDIZATION SECTOR, Geneva, (20040623), pages 1 - 9, Focus Group On Next Generation Networks, URL: http://www.itu.int/ITU-T/ngn/fgngn/docs/FGNGN-011-June04.doc, (20071028), XP002461749 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 4; figures 1-3 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6; figures 4-6 * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 6; figures 7-9 * | [X] - "Architecture for the automatic switched optical networks (ASON); G.8080/Y.1304 (11/01)", ITU-T STANDARD IN FORCE (I), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA,, CH, (20011129), no. G8080/Y1304 11/1, XP017401032 [X] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 6; figure 1 * * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 12, paragraph 7; figures 2-6 * * page 14, paragraph 7.2.1 * * page 18, paragraph 7.3.2 * * page 26, paragraph 7.3.5.3 - page 31, paragraph 7.5.1 * * page 36, paragraph 9 - page 37 * * page 39, paragraph APPENDIX1 * | [X] - LEHR G ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "DESIGN OF A NETWORK LEVEL MANAGEMENT INFORMATION MODEL FOR AUTOMATICALLY SWITCHED TRANSPORT NETWORKS", 2002 IEEE/IFIP NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM. NOMS 2002. FLORENCE, ITALY, APRIL 15 - 19, 2002, IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020415), ISBN 0-7803-7382-0, pages 111 - 124, XP001176044 [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 112, paragraph 2 - page 115, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 116, paragraph 4.2 - page 120, paragraph 6; figures 2,3 * * page 122; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.2002.1015553 | [A] - ALCATEL, "ATM in the next generation network - ATM-MLPS mediation", ALCATEL TECHNICAL WHITE PAPER, (20010831), pages 1 - 16, XP002236633 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - YOO S J B, "OPTICAL-LABEL SWITCHING, MPLS, MPLAMBDAS, AND GMPLS", OPTICAL NETWORKS MAGAZINE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (200305), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1388-6916, pages 17 - 31, XP001162964 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0237730 (FIREBIT LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2003005034 (AMIN RAJESH B [US]); | [A]KR20040001203 (KT CORP); | [A] - ZHIBIN Q., "IP Optical Network Designing.", OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY., (2002), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 5 - 7, XP008091008 | [A] - WANG X ET AL, "MPLS Protocal Corresponding to Next Generation Network.", JOURNAL OF SHANDONG UNIVERSITY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY (NATURAL SCIENCE)., (200212), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 64 - 66, XP008092257 |