EP1797215 - COMPONENT COMPRISING A COATING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBENER, Thomas Im Handbachtal 69 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
SCHMAHL, Milan Ulmenallee 103 45479 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
STAMM, Werner Kahlenberg 18 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2007/25] | Application number, filing date | 05784519.0 | 29.08.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP54230 | Priority number, date | EP20040023705 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04023705 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037700 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797215 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/04 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
C23C14/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2008/02] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEIL MIT BESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER BESCHICHTUNG | [2007/25] | English: | COMPONENT COMPRISING A COATING AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COATING | [2007/25] | French: | ELEMENT DOTE D'UN REVETEMENT ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN REVETEMENT | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5558922 (GUPTA ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 65 * [Y] 8; | [X]US2002141872 (DAROLIA RAMGOPAL ET AL) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraph [0032]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2002106457 (LEE CHING-PANG ET AL) [X] 9-12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0031] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0945594 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0017] * | Examination | JPS58190892 |