EP1793833 - MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vasogen Ireland Limited Shannon Airport House Shannon County Clare / IE | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLAN, Yvonne, Mairead University College Cork Cork / IE | 02 /
LYNCH, Marina Annetta Trinity College Dublin, College Green Dublin 2 / IE | 03 /
BOLTON, Anthony Ernest, Vasogen Ireland Limited Unit 01, North Ring Business Park, Santry Dublin 9 / IE | 04 /
MANDEL, Arkady, Vasogen Inc. 2155 Dunwin Drive, Suite 10 Mississauga, Ontario L5L 4M1 / CA | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Brown, David Leslie HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05784528.1 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005EP09994 | Priority number, date | IE20040000613 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: IE 20040613 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029886 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793833 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/683, A61K31/685, A61K9/127, A61K47/46, A61P37/00 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/683 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | 12.04.2007 | BA | 12.04.2007 | HR | 12.04.2007 | MK | 12.04.2007 | YU | 12.04.2007 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG GEGEN MULTIPLE SKLEROSE | [2007/24] | English: | MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS TREATMENT | [2007/24] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02058622 (NEOPHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-14,16-18,23-31,33-35,40-48,50 * page 7, lines 24-26 * * page 8; example 1 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO0232400 (NEOPHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-14,16-18,23-31,33-35,40-48,50 * page 7, lines 28-30 * * example 1 * * claims 1-3,16 *; | [DA]US2004013718 (BOLTON ANTHONY E [GB], et al) [DA] 1-50 * the whole document * |