EP1797377 - A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundy Refrigeration International Holding B.V. c/o Amaco Management Services B.V. Weena 340 3012 NJ Rotterdam / NL | [2011/20] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states TI GROUP AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LIMITED 4650 Kingsgate, Oxford Business Park South, Cascade Way Oxford OX4 2SU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIKLUND, Bengt, Ake Badgaten 23 S-46730 Grästurp / SE | 02 /
BERGGREN, Göte, Gunnar Magdalenag 94 S-53138 Lidküping / SE | 03 /
MOGENSEN, Leo, Ostergaard Peter Svinthsvej 9 DK-7442 Engesvang / DK | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson Burrington Limited 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | ||
Former [2007/25] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05784561.2 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005GB03700 | Priority number, date | GB20040021274 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0421274 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032922 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797377 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797377 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/02, F25B41/06, F28D7/10, F28F21/08 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F28F19/06 (EP,KR,US);
F25B39/02 (KR);
F25B40/06 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/37 (EP,KR,US);
F28D7/0016 (EP,KR,US);
F28D7/10 (EP,KR,US);
F28F21/08 (KR);
F28F21/082 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2400/052 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2007/25] | English: | A HEAT EXCHANGER | [2007/25] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/38] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | BE | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2415243 (HICKMAN CHARLES E) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]DE973828 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-31 * figure - *; | [X]GB1031989 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2631688 (WHIRLPOOL INT [NL]) [X] 1-31 * figure - *; | [X]US5890375 (STAAHL MAURI [SE], et al) [X] 1-31* figure - * |