EP1778368 - TREADMILL DECK LOCKING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nautilus, Inc. 16400 SE Nautilus Way Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Nautilus, Inc. 16400 SE Nautilus Way Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | ||
For all designated states Crawford, Douglas A. 2543 Otter Court Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | |||
For all designated states Huang, Kuo-Ti No. 11 Guanghua Village Zhuqi Shiang Chiayi County, 604 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIER, Keith M. 14532 Dehia Street Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
CRAWFORD, Douglas, A. 2543 Otter Court Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | 03 /
HUANG, KUO-Ti (Tim) No. 11 Guanghua Village, Zhuqi Shiang Chiayi County, 604 / TW | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
WEIER, Keith M. 460 Strathmore Lane, Nr. 107 Lafayette, Colorado 80026 / US | ||
02 /
CRAWFORD, Douglas, A. 2543 Otter Court Lafayette, CO 80026 / US | |||
03 /
HUANG, KUO-Ti (Tim) No. 11 Guanghua Village, Zhuqi Shiang Chiayi County, 604 / TW | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05785375.6 | 17.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US29316 | Priority number, date | US20040602349P | 17.08.2004 Original published format: US 602349 P | US20050205470 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: US 205470 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006023596 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778368 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/02 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A63B22/02 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUFBANDFLÄCHENVERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2007/18] | English: | TREADMILL DECK LOCKING MECHANISM | [2007/18] | French: | MECANISME DE VERROUILLAGE DE PLANCHER DE TAPIS ROULANT | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 22.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4757987 (ALLEMAND DONALD R [US]); | [A]US5733228 (STEVENS CLIVE GRAHAM [NZ]) |