EP1800403 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR ACTIVATING A POWER SEMICONDUCTOR SWITCH, AND A CONVERTER EQUIPPED WITH A SIGNAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CELANOVIC, Nikola Kronengasse 2 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 02 /
MEYSENC, Luc 14 rue Chancelière F-38120 Le Fontanil / FR | 03 /
MAZUR, Michael Röschibachweg 3 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | 04 /
RUDOLF, Paul Josebodenweg 13a CH-5234 Villigen / CH | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2007/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 05786735.0 | 04.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005CH00574 | Priority number, date | EP20040405648 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04405648 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039823 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800403 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800403 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/785 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H03K17/78 (EP,US);
H03K17/082 (EP,US);
H02M1/0003 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (EP,US);
H02M7/797 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES LEISTUNGSHALBLEITERSCHALTERS SOWIE EIN UMRICHTER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/26] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR ACTIVATING A POWER SEMICONDUCTOR SWITCH, AND A CONVERTER EQUIPPED WITH A SIGNAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM OF THIS TYPE | [2007/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX SERVANT A PILOTER AU MOINS UN COMMUTATEUR STATIQUE DE PUISSANCE ET CONVERTISSEUR MUNI D'UN TEL SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2005 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | IE | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | LU | 04.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
LU | 04.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 18.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5210479 (KIMURA SHIN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 15 - column 8, line 47; figures 3,4A *; | [Y]US5383082 (NISHIZAWA YUJI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0980142 (ABB INDUSTRY OY [FI]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0996227 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |