EP1786637 - HOLLOW-BODIED COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPONENT OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Peter Flurstrasse 30 82131 Gauting / DE | [2007/21] | Application number, filing date | 05786943.0 | 05.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005DE01548 | Priority number, date | DE20041043658 | 07.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004043658 | [2007/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026963 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786637 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60G7/00 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B60G7/001 (EP,US);
B60G7/00 (KR);
B62D1/16 (KR);
B60G2206/11 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8205 (EP,US);
B60G2206/82092 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOHLK\RPERBAUTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DERARTIGEN BAUTEILES | [2007/21] | English: | HOLLOW-BODIED COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPONENT OF THIS TYPE | [2007/21] | French: | ELEMENT A CORPS CREUX ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 31.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10181640 ; | [A]US5271687 (HOLKA THOMAS C [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5716155 (YOSHIDA SUGURU [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5909888 (BETZ CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10181640 A 19980707 (MITSUBISHI ALUM CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |