EP1778271 - PEPTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HERPES VIRUS INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPF Pharmaceuticals GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Str. 31 30625 Hannover / DE | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSSMANN, Wolf-Georg Kaiser-Wilhelm-Str. 23A 30559 Hannover / DE | 02 /
KIRCHHOFF, Frank Schmiedgasse 21-3 89077 Ulm / DE | 03 /
MÜNCH, Jan Weserstr. 6 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 04 /
STÄNDKER, Ludger Schlegelplatz 1 30625 Hannover / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
FORSSMANN, Wolf-Georg Kaiser-Wilhelm-Str. 23A 30559 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
KIRCHHOFF, Frank Schmiedgasse 21-3 89077 Ulm / DE | |||
03 /
MÜNCH, Jan Einsteinstrasse 17-2 89077 Ulm / DE | |||
04 /
STÄNDKER, Ludger Schlegelplatz 1 30625 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05786951.3 | 16.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005EP54028 | Priority number, date | EP20040019552 | 18.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04019552 | US20040602313P | 18.08.2004 Original published format: US 602313 P | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006018431 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778271 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778271 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/01, A61K38/17, A61P31/22 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/017 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEPTIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN MIT DEM HERPES-VIRUS | [2007/18] | English: | PEPTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HERPES VIRUS INFECTIONS | [2007/18] | French: | PEPTIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES INFECTIONS HERPETIQUES | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2008 | BE | 22.10.2008 | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | IT | 22.10.2008 | LT | 22.10.2008 | LV | 22.10.2008 | PL | 22.10.2008 | RO | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | TR | 22.10.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | GR | 23.01.2009 | ES | 02.02.2009 | IS | 22.02.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | HU | 23.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LV | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
HU | 23.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LV | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LV | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
BE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LV | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
LT | 22.10.2008 | ||
LV | 22.10.2008 | ||
PL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
IS | 22.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 22.10.2008 | |
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 02.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS649997 ; | [AD]WO0194386 (IPF PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] * the whole document *; | [A]GB2382347 (PANZERI EZIO [IE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1481988 (IPF PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * claims 1,8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 013, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), & JP01009997 A 19890113 (TORAY IND INC) [A] * abstract * |