EP1776134 - C-MET KINASE BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Mountain View Inc. 2450 Bayshore Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEMMER, Willem, P. C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 02 /
PERLROTH, D., Victor 2345 Cornell Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
SATYAL, Sanjeev 3320 Brittan Avenue, 1 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
ALBA, Benjamin, M. 1245 Crestwood Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
BAKKER, Alice 1234 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
DUGUAY, Amy, N. 18242 Baylor Avenue Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 07 /
LIU, Qiang 55 Wlliams Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 08 /
SILVERMAN, Joshua 829 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 09 /
SMITH, Richard 113 Sierra Vista Avenue, Apt. H Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 10 /
SWIMMER, Candace 1064 Carolina Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
STEMMER, Willem, P. C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | ||
02 /
PERLROTH, D., Victor 2345 Cornell Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
03 /
SATYAL, Sanjeev 3320 Brittan Avenue, 1 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
04 /
ALBA, Benjamin, M. 1245 Crestwood Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
05 /
BAKKER, Alice 1234 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
DUGUAY, Amy, N. 1 Elmhurst Drive San Francisco, CA 94132 / US | |||
07 /
LIU, Qiang 55 Wlliams Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
08 /
SILVERMAN, Joshua 829 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
09 /
SMITH, Richard 113 Sierra Vista Avenue, Apt. H Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
10 /
SWIMMER, Candace 1064 Carolina Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
STEMMER, Willem, P. C. 108 Kathy Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | ||
02 /
PERLROTH, D., Victor 2345 Cornell Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
03 /
SATYAL, Sanjeev 3320 Brittan Avenue, 1 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
04 /
ALBA, Benjamin, M. 1245 Crestwood Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
05 /
BAKKER, Alice 1234 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
DUGUAY, Amy, N. 1 Elmhurst Drive San Francisco, CA 94132 / US | |||
07 /
LIU, Qiang 55 Wlliams Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
08 /
SILVERMAN, Joshua 856 Georgetown Place San Jose, CA 95126 / US | |||
09 /
SMITH, Richard 113 Sierra Vista Avenue, Apt. H Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
10 /
SWIMMER, Candace 1064 Carolina Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05787547.8 | 17.06.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005US21558 | Priority number, date | US20040871602 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: US 871602 | US20040957351 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 957351 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006009888 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776134 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07H21/02, G01N33/53 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
G01N33/543 (KR);
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | 02.01.2007 | BA | 02.01.2007 | HR | 02.01.2007 | LV | 02.01.2007 | MK | 02.01.2007 | YU | 02.01.2007 | Title | German: | C-MET-KINASEBINDENDE PROTEINE | [2007/17] | English: | C-MET KINASE BINDING PROTEINS | [2007/17] | French: | PROTEINES DE LIAISON DE KINASE C-MET | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 07.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP09176476.1 / EP2151453 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02088171 (MAXYGEN INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-14,28 * see the whole document; esp. Fig. 10 *; | WO0216600 [ ] (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al); | WO02068649 [ ] (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) | [ ] - "Human A domain from LRP2 #21.", Geneseq, (20030508), Database accession no. ABU61331, URL: EBI | [X] - "Sequence 85 from Patent WO0216600.", EPO Proteins, (20020702), Database accession no. AX449750, URL: EBI, XP002532122 [X] 1-4,11-14,28 * see abstract * | [X] - "Sequence 814 from Patent WO02068649.", EPO Proteins, (20031218), Database accession no. AX922474, URL: EBI, XP002532123 [X] 1-4,11-14,28 * see abstract * | International search | [X]US2003082575 (SCHULTZ PETER [US], et al); | [X]US2003078737 (KEYS DANIEL A [US], et al) | [X] - NIELSON M S ET AL, "Segments in the C-terminal folding domain of lipoprotein lipase important for binidng to the low density ipoprotien receptor-related protein and to heparan sulfate proteoglycans", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970228), vol. 272, no. 9, pages 5821 - 5827, XP002997431 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.9.5821 | by applicant | US2005048512 | - BIRCHMEIER ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 4, pages 915 - 925 | - PARK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, no. 18, page 6379 | - FRISHMAN, D.; ARGOS, P., "Knowledge-based secondary structure assignment", PROTEINS, (1995), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 566 - 79 | - JONES, D.T., "Protein secondary structure prediction based on position-specific scoring matrices", J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 292, pages 195 - 202 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - HOWELL; HERTZ, "The LDL receptor gene family: signaling functions during development", CURRENT OPINION IN NEUROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 11, pages 74 - 81 | - KRIEGER, "The "best" of cholesterols, the "worst" of cholesterols: A tale of two receptors", PNAS, (1998), vol. 95, pages 4077 - 4080 | - GOLDSTEIN; BROWN, "The Cholesterol Quartet", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 292, pages 1310 - 1312 | - MOESTRUP; VERROUST, "Megalin-and Cubilin-Mediated Endocytosis of Protein-Bound Vitamins, Lipids, and Hormones in Polarized Epithelia", ANN. REV. NUTR., (2001), vol. 21, pages 407 - 28 | - ROSZMUSZ ET AL., BBRC, (2002), vol. 296, page 156 | - HIGGINS ET AL., IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 5777 - 85 | - SCHULTZ-CHERRY ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 7304 - 7310 | - SCHULTZ-CHERRY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 26783 - 8 | - BORK, FEBS LETT, (1993), vol. 327, pages 125 - 30 | - LEUNG-HAGESTEIJN ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, pages 289 - 99 | - SANDS; PODOLSKY, ANNU. REV. PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 58, pages 253 - 273 | - CARR ET AL., PNAS USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 2206 - 2210 | - DEA, PNAS USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 1084 - 1088 | - HOFFMAN ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM SCI, (1993), vol. 18, pages 239 - 243 | - MOLINA ET AL., EUR. J BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 240, pages 125 - 133 | - GUNCAR ET AL., EMBO J, (1999), vol. 18, pages 793 - 803 | - CHONG; SPEICHER, DW, (2001), vol. 276, pages 5804 - 5813 | - CLONTECH CATALOG, (2000), pages 110 - 111 | - STEMMER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, pages 49 - 53 |