EP1802591 - QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLE, Patrick, AstraZeneca Reims Z.I. la Pompelle BP 1050 F-51689 Reims, Cedex 2 / FR | 02 /
JUNG, Frederic Henri, AstraZeneca Reims Z.I. la Pompelle BP 1050 F-51689 Reims, Cedex 2 / FR | [2012/02] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
PLE, Patrick, AstraZeneca Reims Z.I. la Pompelle BP 1050 F-51689 Reims, Cedex 2 / FR | ||
02 /
JUNG, Frederic Henri, AstraZeneca Reims Z.I. la Pompelle BP 1050 F-51689 Reims, Cedex 2 / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 05789135.0 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005GB03846 | Priority number, date | EP20040292417 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04292417 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040520 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802591 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802591 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/88, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D417/12, A61K31/517, A61P35/00 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | HR | 14.05.2007 | Title | German: | CHINAZOLINDERIVATE | [2007/27] | English: | QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES | [2007/27] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINAZOLINE | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2005 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | IE | 07.10.2012 | LU | 07.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.10.2012 | ||
LU | 07.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9609294 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [DX] 1 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 5 * [Y] 1-14; | [DY]WO9615118 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [DY]WO9703069 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-14 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 4 *; | [DY]WO0021955 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-14* page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 19 *; | [DY]WO0121596 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-14 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 30; tables 1-14 *; | [DY]WO0121594 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-14 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 28 *; | [Y]US2003187002 (MORTLOCK ANDREW [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14 * Tables *; | [DY]WO2004058781 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-14 * page 3, line 28 - page 5, line 14 *; | [PY]WO2004113324 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PY] 1-14 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 2 * |