EP1794373 - SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westcott, Tom 16 Kenburn avenue Cherrybrook NSW 2128 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Westcott, Tom 16 Kenburn avenue Cherrybrook NSW 2128 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Herbjörnsen, Rut, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Herbjörnsen, Rut, et al Albihns Stockholm Ab IT/EI, P.O. Box 5581 S-114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05789377.8 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005AU01479 | Priority number, date | AU20040905581 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: AU 2004905581 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006034536 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794373 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/10, E04H17/00, E04H17/20 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
E01F13/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZSTRUKTUR FÜR ABSCHIRMUNG | [2007/24] | English: | SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR A SCREEN | [2007/24] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT POUR ECRAN | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US193573 ; | [X]GB2129845 (HOWARD VICTOR SMARDON); | [Y]US4993719 (HERNANDEZ TIRSO R [US]); | [X]WO9629490 (GEBBIE MARK ALAN [NZ]); | [A]EP1184514 (BODART & VALTER ATEL [BE]); | [Y]AU2003100255 (TSAKONAS CON); | [A]US6733204 (PANICCIA RONALD F [US]) |