EP1791841 - 2-SUBSTITUTED-1-DEAZA PURINE DERIVATIVES WITH ADENOSINE RECEPTOR MODULATING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Healthcare Products B.V. C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 1381 CP Weesp / NL | [2010/21] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Solvay Pharmaceuticals B.V. C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 1381 CP Weesp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Melle c/o Solvay Pharmaceuticals B.V. IPSI Department C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP WEESP / NL | 02 /
DEN HARTOG, J.A.J. c/o Solvay Pharmaceuticals B.V. IPSI Department C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP Weesp / NL | 03 /
WANNER, M.J. c/o Solvay Pharmaceuticals B.V. IPSI Department C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP Weesp / NL | 04 /
KOOMEN, Gerrit-Jan c/o Solvay Pharmaceuticals B.V. IPSI Department C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 NL-1381 CP Weesp / NL | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Verhage, Marinus, et al Octrooibureau Zoan B.V. P.O. Box 140 1380 AC Weesp / NL | [2011/17] |
Former [2007/23] | Hogenbirk, Marijke, et al Octrooibureau Zoan B.V. P.O. Box 140 NL-1380 AC Weesp / NL | Application number, filing date | 05789581.5 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP54405 | Priority number, date | EP20040104345 | 09.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04104345 | US20040608145P | 09.09.2004 Original published format: US 608145 P | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027366 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791841 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P9/00, A61P25/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 10.04.2007 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-SUBSTITUIERTE-1-DEAZA-PURINDERIVATE MIT ADENOSIN- REZEPTORMODULIERUNGSAKTIVITÄT | [2007/23] | English: | 2-SUBSTITUTED-1-DEAZA PURINE DERIVATIVES WITH ADENOSINE RECEPTOR MODULATING ACTIVITY | [2007/23] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 1-DEAZA PURINE 2-SUBSTITUÉS À ACTIVITÉ MODULATRICE DU RECEPTEUR D'ADÉNOSINE | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.07.2011 | 14.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/52] | 19.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0354180 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 9 * * examples 1-17,19,20 *; | [Y] - FRANCIS, JOHN E. ET AL, "A general synthesis of 5,7-diaminoimidazo[4,5-b]pyridine ribosides (2-amino-1-deazaadenosines) from 5-amino-4-imidazolecarboxamide riboside (AICA riboside)", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY , 70(5), 1288-95 CODEN: CJCHAG; ISSN: 0008-4042, (1992), XP009045697 [Y] 1-7 * page 1288, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 1289; compounds 1,2 * * page 1290; compound 16 * * page 1291; compound 20 * * page 1291, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v92-166 | [Y] - CAMAIONI, EMIDIO ET AL, "New substituted 9-alkylpurines as adenosine receptor ligands", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 6(5), 523-533 CODEN: BMECEP; ISSN: 0968-0896, (1998), XP002926121 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 523, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 524, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 526, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 527; table 2 * * page 530, column 2, paragraph 2; example 10b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(98)00007-8 | [Y] - SULLIVAN GAIL W ET AL, "Cyclic AMP-dependent inhibition of human neutrophil oxidative activity by substituted 2-propynylcyclohexyl adenosine A2A receptor agonists", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (200103), vol. 132, no. 5, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1017 - 1026, XP002322595 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1018; compounds CGS21680, MRE0470 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0703893 | [Y] - NIIYA K ET AL, "2-(N'-ALKYLIDENEHYDRAZINO)ADENOSINES: POTENT AND SELECTIVE CORONARYVASODILATORS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1992), vol. 35, no. 24, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4557 - 4561, XP000918397 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4557, column 2, line 7 - page 4558, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 4558, column 2, paragraph LAST - page 4560, column 2, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00102a007 | [Y] - NIIYA K ET AL, "2-(N'-ARALKYLIDENEHYDRAZINO)ADENOSINES: POTENT AND SELECTIVE CORONARY VASODILATORS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1992), vol. 35, no. 24, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4562 - 4566, XP000918386 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4562, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4563, column 1, paragraph LAST - page 4565, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4566; examples 29,31,32,35 * * table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00102a008 | [YD] - WANNER M J ET AL, "2-Nitro analogues of adenosine and 1-deazaadenosine: synthesis and binding studies at the adenosine A1, A2A and A3 receptor subtypes", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (200009), vol. 10, no. 18, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2141 - 2144, XP004208330 [YD] 5 * abstract * * page 2141, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2143, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00415-7 |