EP1797341 - BLIND RIVET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUG, Willi Merzenbergstrasse 37 72250 Freudenstadt-Musbach / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFFER, Marc Blumenstrasse 32 72160 Horb-Bildechingen / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Suchy, Ulrich Johannes, et al fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Gewerbliche Schutzrechte Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Suchy, Ulrich Johannes, et al fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Suchy, Ulrich Johannes fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05789701.9 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP10095 | Priority number, date | DE20041049045 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049045 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006039981 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797341 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797341 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/08 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F16B19/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLINDNIETE | [2007/25] | English: | BLIND RIVET | [2007/25] | French: | RIVET BORGNE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IE | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | LT | 25.11.2009 | LV | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | IS | 25.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
LV | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
LT | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IS | 25.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2334385 (HESTERMANN GERHARD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE3744450 (BOELLHOFF & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-11; | [AD]EP0351715 (HILTI AG [LI]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0045056 (BERGNER RICHARD GMBH CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |