EP1797819 - BLOOD PRESSURE METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIHARA, Kimihisa, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHIDA, Shoichi, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 03 /
MINO, Shinji, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 04 /
KOIZUMI, Hiroshi, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 05 /
TATARA, Naoe, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 06 /
OGUCHI, Taisuke, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | 07 /
SHIMADA, Junichi, NTT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CNTR 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808585 / JP | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05790232.2 | 04.10.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005JP18370 | Priority number, date | JP20040294301 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004294301 | [2007/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006038628 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797819 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797819 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022, A61B5/0245 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/02225 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (KR);
A61B5/02116 (EP,US);
A61B5/022 (KR);
A61B5/6816 (EP,US);
A61B5/6817 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/02] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLUTDRUCKMESSGERÄT | [2007/25] | English: | BLOOD PRESSURE METER | [2007/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE PRESSION SANGUINE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | Translation filed | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 09.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2010 | 11.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0073123 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [Y] 7-18 * page 5, line 5 - line 20; figure 2 * * page 6, line 1 - line 2 *; | [A]EP0678277 (NIHON KOHDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 7-18* figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2003036685 (GOODMAN JESSE B [CA]) [A] 7-18 * paragraph [0138]; figures 4,6 * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0114] *; | [XY]US2003060721 (NAKAZAWA FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,19-30 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012]; figures 2,6 * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0118] * [Y] 7-18; | [X]US2004176692 (KARIO KAZUOMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,19,22-25,27-30 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0129] * | International search | [X]JPS61193643 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JPH04256727 (HIKARI GIKEN KK); | [X]JPH10286241 (NIPPON COLIN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001070260 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) | Examination | JPS5334292U | US6172743 | WO03073924 |