EP1804408 - DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUSE, Masaru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
FURUSAWA, Satoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
IKUSHIMA, Tsuyoshi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
SHIOZAKI, Toru Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 3-7 Shiromi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Gassner & Partner Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790340.3 | 05.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005JP18471 | Priority number, date | JP20040294113 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004294113 | JP20040317186 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004317186 | JP20040317187 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004317187 | JP20040330980 | 15.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004330980 | JP20050009559 | 17.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005009559 | JP20050049460 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005049460 | JP20050095794 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095794 | [2007/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006038660 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804408 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04K1/02, H04B10/00, H04L25/49 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
H04K3/825 (EP,US);
H04L9/065 (KR);
H04B10/85 (KR);
H04K1/02 (EP,US);
H04K3/43 (EP,US);
H04L25/4917 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/48] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2007/27] | English: | DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2007/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | Translation filed | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 08.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06104793 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y] - QUANTUM STREAM CIPER BASED ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20010708), page 14, URL: http://xxx.gov/listquant-ph/0407, XP002996386 | [L] - NISHIOKA T. ET AL, "Security of Y-00 protocol.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 SYMPOSIUM ON CRYPTOGRAPHY AND INFORMATION SECURITY., (20040127), vol. 1 OF 2, pages 237 - 242, XP002996387 |